ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS ABERCONWY BRANCH

Charity number: 224340
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £216.08k £253.11k £247.15k £324.41k £280.09k
Total expenditure £240.98k £269.44k £267.90k £301.95k £311.42k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A