THE PHILLIPS MEMORIAL CHARITY

Charity number: 224430
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 05 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 11 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 12 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 29 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2016 17 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 Not Required