THE PHILLIPS MEMORIAL CHARITY

Charity number: 224430
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £8.10k £8.15k £8.54k £8.44k £8.82k
Total expenditure £10.04k £8.44k £7.36k £6.47k £6.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A