HUDDERSFIELD AND DISTRICT SOCIETY FOR THE DEAF

Charity number: 224530
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £36.99k £25.57k £16.93k £19.05k £25.56k
Total expenditure £47.40k £30.94k £14.11k £12.93k £24.78k
Income from government contracts £6.00k £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £2.50k N/A N/A N/A