PENDLE HILL AREA MEETING

Charity number: 224603
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £674.06k £102.96k £119.96k £99.55k £99.92k
Total expenditure £492.24k £193.06k £102.87k £102.29k £87.57k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £10.90k
Income - Donations and legacies £147.45k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £62.35k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £749 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £463.51k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £113.65k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £18.74k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £134.90k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £966 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £338.60k N/A N/A N/A N/A