PENDLE HILL AREA MEETING

Charity number: 224603
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Gordon James Benson Trustee 01 January 2021 None on record
CHRIS TONGE Trustee 25 June 2011 None on record
Lucy Armstrong Trustee 01 January 2018 None on record
Norma Lee Trustee 01 January 2013 None on record
Anthony Robinson Trustee 01 January 2020 None on record
Hilary Whitehead Trustee 01 January 2021 None on record