PERCIVAL J HAY MEMORIAL PRIZE

Charity number: 224889
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 29 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 16 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 16 May 2019 100 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 17 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2016 28 March 2017 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 Not Required