GARGRAVE POOR'S LANDS

Charity number: 225067
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £30.82k £29.20k £26.86k £26.14k £26.50k
Total expenditure £24.10k £47.25k £55.39k £23.76k £36.15k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A