THE PENSFORD SOCIAL WELFARE CENTRE

Charity number: 225346
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £3.73k £8.41k £4.68k £5.60k £5.65k
Total expenditure £1.35k £2.82k £3.98k £1.81k £1.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A