SHEFFIELD ROTARY CHARITY

Charity number: 225487
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 04 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 30 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 14 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 25 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 12 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 28 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 12 December 2016 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 30 September 2016 On time Download