THE HOSPITAL OF THE HOLY TRINITY, AYLESFORD

Charity number: 225510
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 30 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 30 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 22 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 22 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 15 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 16 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 08 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 25 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 30 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 18 January 2017 On time Download