MARY JACKSON'S CHARITY FOR WIDOWS

Charity number: 225628
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 19 June 2020 25 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 19 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 19 June 2019 27 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 19 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 19 June 2018 14 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 19 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 19 June 2017 08 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 19 June 2017 Not Required
Annual return 19 June 2016 24 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 19 June 2016 Not Required