MARY JACKSON'S CHARITY FOR WIDOWS

Charity number: 225628
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 19/06/2016 19/06/2017 19/06/2018 19/06/2019 19/06/2020
Total gross income £2.79k £1.86k £3.09k £3.08k £3.15k
Total expenditure £3.49k £3.17k £3.41k £3.03k £3.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A