BRITISH HEART FOUNDATION

Charity number: 225971
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
  • 26 March 1963: Standard registration
  • 12 December 2012: Funds received from 1006714 NO SMOKING DAY
  • 05 November 2014: Funds received from 1093520 THE JOHN NICKOLS FOUNDATION
  • 12 December 2016: Funds received from 1117823 MARGARET ELUNED JAMES CHARITABLE TRUST
  • 03 January 2018: Funds received from 1058953 INNER WHEEL CLUB OF ROSS-ON-WYE
  • 31 January 2018: Funds received from 1061461 DAISY CHAIN NURSERY SCHOOL
  • 15 May 2019: Funds received from 802039 THE DOMINIC KING FUND
  • 20 October 2020: Funds received from 1080493 THE BASIL LARSEN 1999 CHARITABLE TRUST
  • 04 February 2021: Funds received from 1062189 SOCIETY OF FRIENDS OF ST PAUL'S MEDICAL CENTRE
  • 29 November 2021: Funds received from 1048746 WATFORD HEART SUPPORT GROUP
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • BHF (Working name)
  • THE HEART FOUNDATION (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property