BRITISH HEART FOUNDATION

Charity number: 225971
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Sarah Catherine Clarke Trustee 16 October 2018
THE ROYAL COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS OF LONDON Received: On time
Professor Sir Munir Pirmohamed Trustee 06 October 2020
BRITISH PHARMACOLOGICAL SOCIETY Received: On time
Prof John Iredale Trustee 01 November 2016
THE FOUNDATION FOR LIVER RESEARCH Received: On time
Professor David Lomas Trustee 01 November 2016
THE FRANCIS CRICK INSTITUTE LIMITED Received: On time
Sir John Hood Trustee 26 April 2021 None on record
Daryl Fielding Trustee 24 October 2017
PELICAN CANCER FOUNDATION Received: On time
Mark FitzPatrick CA Trustee 06 October 2020 None on record
Professor Jill Pell Trustee 06 October 2020 None on record
Karen Frank Trustee 08 October 2019 None on record
Peter Phippen Trustee 25 January 2017
THE JOHN HAMPDEN GRAMMAR SCHOOL FUND Received: On time
THE NZ-UK LINK FOUNDATION Received: On time
Dr Doug Gurr Chair 01 October 2015 None on record
TIMOTHY HOWE Trustee 16 October 2018 None on record
Dr Annalisa Jenkins Trustee 12 October 2021 None on record