Trustees NACRO
Charity number: 226171
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicholas Lionel Harwick | Chair | 20 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philippa Oldmeadow | Trustee | 20 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Main Langellier | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Walker | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Felicity Oswald | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Maneer Afsar | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Mary Dickens | Trustee | 18 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Shamaila Farrah Mailk | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tabitha Kaseem | Trustee | 23 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
David George Hanson | Trustee | 23 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anne Frost | Trustee | 23 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Neil Spence | Trustee | 22 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
LYNN EMSLIE | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Billany | Trustee | 01 November 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.