UNITED CHARITIES FETCHAM

Charity number: 226276
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 27 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 27 March 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 12 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 12 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 04 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 04 April 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 07 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 25 April 2016 On time Download