Trustees ROYAL ASTRONOMICAL SOCIETY
Charity number: 226545
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
22 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Michael Geoffrey Edmunds | Chair | 14 May 2021 |
|
|||||
PROFESSOR ADRIAN MICHAEL CRUISE | Trustee | 11 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr Ashley Spindler | Trustee | 12 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Professor Michael Lockwood | Trustee | 12 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Professor James Hammond | Trustee | 12 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Professor Andrew Curtis | Trustee | 12 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr Imogen Gingell | Trustee | 12 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Professor Derek Ward-Thompson | Trustee | 12 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr Alan Cayless | Trustee | 12 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr Matthew Middleton | Trustee | 12 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr Clare Watt | Trustee | 13 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Professor Stephen Eales | Trustee | 13 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Patricia Tomkins | Trustee | 13 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Olivia Keenan | Trustee | 13 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Professor Silvia Zane | Trustee | 13 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Jasmine Sandhu | Trustee | 14 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Dr Joanna Barstow | Trustee | 14 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Dr Belinda Wilkes | Trustee | 14 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Professor Caroline Smith | Trustee | 14 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sheona Urquhart | Trustee | 10 May 2019 |
|
|||||
Prof Mark Lester | Trustee | 12 May 2017 |
|
|||||
Prof Steven Miller | Trustee | 12 May 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.