Dogfen lywodraethu RED BANK SCHOOLS LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 10/1/1900 AS AMENDED 2/3/1964 AND 9/1/1995 MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10 JAN 1900 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 31 JAN 2020 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 14 FEB 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE CHARITY’S OBJECT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IS TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE BY: (1) PROMOTING THE EDUCATION OF VULNERABLE YOUNG PEOPLE WITH LEARNING, SOCIAL AND BEHAVIOURAL DIFFICULTIES; AND (2) ASSISTING IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT ANY CHARITY WHOSE AIMS INCLUDE ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS.
Maes buddion
UNRESTRICTED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.