Financial history HARTHILL TEA DAY SOCIAL CLUB

Charity number: 226997
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £8.99k £11.89k £15.51k £11.62k £3.56k
Total expenditure £10.13k £9.02k £9.59k £11.68k £2.56k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £6.61k £3.35k N/A