WELFARE HOUSE

Charity number: 227152
Charity reporting is overdue by 14 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 Overdue Overdue by 14 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Overdue Overdue by 14 days
Annual return 30 June 2019 02 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 30 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 26 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2016 01 May 2017 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 Not Required