WELFARE HOUSE

Charity number: 227152
Charity reporting is overdue by 13 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2015 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019
Total gross income £3.93k £3.39k £3.65k £3.74k £4.41k
Total expenditure £4.46k £5.09k £3.35k £4.36k £5.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A