Governing document BRADFORD FLOWER FUND HOMES
Charity number: 227170
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 31/03/1958 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/03/1959 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/07/1964 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/02/1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/09/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/09/2015
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF ELDERLY FOLK BY THE PROVISION OF HOMES AND DWELLINGS.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
BRADFORD
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.