ST CLEMENT PARISH HALL

Charity number: 227570
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £1.73k £1.94k £2.56k £2.53k £2.89k
Total expenditure £913 £787 £831 £1.26k £993
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A