SOCIETY OF THE SACRED HEART

Charity number: 227848
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 29 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 28 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 28 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 29 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 29 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 21 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 21 March 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 10 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 10 March 2017 On time Download