SOCIETY OF THE SACRED HEART

Charity number: 227848
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £2.42m £2.19m £8.47m £3.12m £0
Total expenditure £2.68m £2.82m £3.53m £55.90m £0
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £774.83k £732.31k £1.03m £816.31k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities £175.09k £166.43k £160.44k £109.93k N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £1.15m £1.17m £1.18m £1.08m N/A
Income - Other £326.69k £123.02k £6.10m £1.11m N/A
Income - Legacies £40.50k £12.14k £275.60k £97.42k N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.68m £2.82m £3.53m £7.16m N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance £37.20k £39.07k £31.14k £31.80k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £157.26k £173.52k £259.22k £835.97k N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £48.75m N/A