SOCIETY OF THE SACRED HEART

Charity number: 227848
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sister Margaret Mary Wilson Trustee 01 July 2019 None on record
SISTER MARGARET WALSHE Trustee 26 April 2013
SOCIETY OF THE SACRED HEART CIO Received: On time
DIGBY STUART COLLEGE Received: On time
SISTER CHRISTINE EDWARDS Trustee 01 July 2011
DIGBY STUART COLLEGE Received: On time
Sister Sheila McNamara Trustee 01 May 2015
SOCIETY OF THE SACRED HEART CIO Received: On time
DIGBY STUART COLLEGE Received: On time
Catherine Lloyd Trustee 01 July 2019
SOCIETY OF THE SACRED HEART CIO Received: On time
DIGBY STUART COLLEGE Received: On time
SISTER CHRISTINE AUSTIN Trustee 02 March 2012
DIGBY STUART COLLEGE Received: On time