Dogfen lywodraethu SOLDEN HILL HOUSE LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30TH NOVEMBER 1954 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 12TH JANUARY 1986 AND 25TH FEBRUARY 1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 18 MAR 2017 as amended on 17 Sep 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(1) TO PROVIDE A SUPPORTIVE, STIMULATING AND SAFE HOME FOR ADULTS WITH A WIDE RANGE OF LEARNING DISABILITIES BY THE PROVISION OF RESIDENTIAL ACCOMMODATION AND OF FACILITIES FOR LEARNING, RECREATION, RESPITE CARE AND DAY ACTIVITIES AT THE CHARITY'S PREMISES IN BYFIELD IN THE COUNTY OF NORTHAMPTONSHIRE OR ELSEWHERE (2) TO PROVIDE SUPPORT FOR ADULTS WITH A WIDE RANGE OF LEARNING DISABILITIES AT THE CHARITY'S PREMISES IN BYFIELD IN THE COUNTY OF NORTHAMPTONSHIRE OR ELSEWHERE.
Maes buddion
NATIONAL
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.