WOMEN'S INSTITUTE - LOFTUS IN CLEVELAND

Charity number: 228288
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 11 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 07 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2018 04 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2017 04 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2016 06 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 Not Required