WOMEN'S INSTITUTE - LOFTUS IN CLEVELAND

Charity number: 228288
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £4.65k £5.20k £4.53k £2.06k £1.69k
Total expenditure £3.88k £5.28k £2.87k £2.15k £1.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A