PONTYATES MINERS WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 228339
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £22.35k £20.54k £19.38k £17.90k £19.26k
Total expenditure £17.96k £22.66k £19.23k £19.29k £27.03k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A