ABBOT HALL SOCIAL CENTRE

Charity number: 228877
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PETER MARSHALL Chair None on record
June Mary Lee Trustee 30 August 2011 None on record
Peter Jeffreys Trustee 13 August 2014 None on record
SUSAN HEYES Trustee 01 July 2013 None on record
William Barclay Thomson Trustee 04 July 2020
KENDAL BRIDGE CLUB Received: On time
GRANT BRAMWELL Trustee 16 October 2012 None on record
BRIAN FREDERICK KETTLE Trustee 01 July 2013 None on record
KATHLEEN MARY WEBSTER Trustee None on record
Robin Cope Trustee 13 August 2014 None on record
MARGARET SPROAT Trustee 24 May 2011 None on record
JANET GALLOWAY Trustee None on record
JUDITH JOHNSTON Trustee None on record