WOMEN'S INSTITUTE - POLSTEAD

Charity number: 229033
Charity reporting is overdue by 79 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 79 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 79 days
Annual return 30 September 2019 28 September 2020 60 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 28 September 2020 426 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 26 September 2020 789 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 26 September 2020 1154 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required