BLISS GATE VILLAGE FIELD

Charity number: 229189
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 29/02/2016 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020
Total gross income £838 £4.40k £547 £1.51k £1.67k
Total expenditure £812 £2.19k £3.14k £1.77k £1.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A