THE BRADFIELD FEOFFEES CHARITY

Charity number: 229982
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

1, To help provide relief to persons resident or connected with the Parish of Bradfield who are in need, hardship or distress, primarily through the provision of affordable housing. 2,To further the religious and other charitable work of the Church of England in the Parish of Bradfield.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022

Total income: £97,003
Total expenditure: £70,481

Fundraising

This charity does not raise funds from the public

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Sheffield City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 April 1964: Standard registration
  • 28 January 2003: Removed (Amalgamated)
  • 28 January 2003: Funds transferred to
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • FEOFFEE ESTATE CHARITY (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jonathan Cass Chair 28 November 2020
None on record
John Graham Leslie Marples Trustee 24 May 2022
The Parochial Church Council of the Ecclesiastical Parish of Bradfield, St.Nicholas Church Bradfield
Received: On time
Jane Gregory Trustee 26 October 2021
The Parochial Church Council of the Ecclesiastical Parish of Bradfield, St.Nicholas Church Bradfield
Received: On time
JOHN BARRAND Trustee 19 May 2015
None on record
PATRICIA MAY BANCROFT Trustee 03 February 2014
The Parochial Church Council of the Ecclesiastical Parish of Bradfield, St.Nicholas Church Bradfield
Received: On time
DAVID WRAGG Trustee 03 February 2014
None on record
Vickie Priestley Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £82.08k £90.61k £93.17k £91.76k £97.00k
Total expenditure £112.22k £61.33k £60.75k £59.73k £70.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 10 October 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 10 October 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 30 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 30 September 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 05 November 2021 5 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 31 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 31 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME DATED 28 MAY 1907
Charitable objects
1) FOR THE MAINTENANCE AND UPKEEP OF THE CHURCH OF BRADFIELD 2) PAYMENT TOWARDS THE MAINTENANCE AND REPAIR OF THE FABRIC, OR IN THE MAINTENANCE OF THE SERVICES AND FURNITURE OF ONE OR MORE OF THE CHURCHES OF:-OUGHTIBRIDGE, CHRISTCHURCH, STANNINGTON, ST. JAMES THE LESS- MIDHOPE, ST. MARY- BOLSTERSTONE, ST. JOHN THE EVANGELIST-DEEPEAR AND ST. MATTHIAS-STOCKBRIDGE
Area of benefit
BRADFIELD
Registration history
  • 14 April 1964 : Standard registration
  • 28 January 2003 : Removed
  • 28 January 2003 : Asset transfer out

Contact information

Address:
CO GIBBS & CO
PO Box 4939
DRONFIELD
S18 9DF
Phone:
01246292395
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available