Linked charities ST JOHN'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITIES

Charity number: 230417
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 26 SEPTEMBER 1899 AS VARIED BY SCHEMES OF 27 SEPTEMBER 1907, 1 AUGUST 1916, 28 OCTOBER 1969.
Charitable objects
A. ALMSHOUSES FOR POOR WIDOWS WHO HAVE RESIDED IN THE BOROUGH OF HUNTINGDON FOR NOT LESS THAN TWO YEARS NEXT PRECEDING THE TIME OF THEIR APPOINTMENT. B. PAYMENTS TO THE RECTOR FOR THE TIME BIENG OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS WITH ST JOHN THE BAPTIST HUNTINGDON AND TO THE VICAR FOR THE TIME BEING OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY WITH ST BENEDICT, HUNTINGDON.
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF HUNTINGDON
Registration history
  • 09 December 1963 : Standard registration