Trustees THE ROYAL LIVERPOOL PHILHARMONIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 230538
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Louise Claire Shepherd Chair 14 November 2022
None on record
Stephen Raymond Gregory Trustee 14 November 2022
None on record
Sameeta Joanne Gahir Trustee 02 November 2020
None on record
claire jackson Trustee 04 November 2019
None on record
Vanessa Bakewell Trustee 05 November 2018
None on record
Angela Bellingham Trustee 05 November 2018
None on record
Estelle Morris Trustee 04 December 2017
None on record
Susannah Jordan Trustee 06 November 2017
None on record
MICHAEL GEORGE EAKIN Trustee
LIVERPOOL PHILHARMONIC FOUNDATION
Received: On time