Accounts and annual returns GARDEMAU CHURCH CHARITY

Charity number: 230602
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 27 April 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 02 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 02 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 31 August 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 02 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 28 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required