Financial history LISBURNE HALL

Charity number: 230810
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £3.03k £3.03k £13.36k £300 £568
Total expenditure £3.98k £2.90k £2.67k £11.73k £1.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £10.00k N/A N/A