THE SOCIETY OF ANTIQUARIES OF NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE

Charity number: 230888
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £67.15k £75.70k £83.41k £62.45k £59.27k
Total expenditure £69.44k £65.77k £73.99k £60.88k £64.93k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A