Financial history THE MAY LADY TENNYSON MEMORIAL AMBULANCE TRUST

Charity number: 231093
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £10.98k £13.25k £9.59k £8.23k £6.80k
Total expenditure £5.79k £5.30k £9.16k £6.85k £5.42k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A