ST DAVIDS DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE

Charity number: 231239
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

20 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Timothy James Llewelyn Trustee 24 July 2018
FRIENDS OF ST PETER'S CHURCH (CARMARTHEN) Received: On time
Rev Peter Graham Bruce Ratcliffe Trustee 17 October 2018
UNITED BENEFICE OF BRO TEIFI Recently registered
David William James Thomas Trustee 18 July 2017 None on record
Arwel Bowen Charles Davies Trustee 01 January 2019
THE FRIENDS OF ST DAVIDS CATHEDRAL Received: On time
John Richard Cecil Trustee 31 July 2019 None on record
JUDITH ANNE PRIOR HAYWARD Trustee 14 July 2016 None on record
DANIEL GURNOS JONES Trustee None on record
NIGEL ROBERTS Trustee 27 September 2011
ORIEL MYRDDIN Received: 40 days late
CARMARTHEN FAMILY CENTRE Received: On time
Charles Carter Trustee 26 June 2018
THE PICTON CASTLE TRUST
THE RT REVEREND JOANNA SUSAN PENBERTHY Trustee 11 February 2017
ST DAVID'S DIOCESAN COUNCIL FOR SOCIAL RESPONSIBILITY Received: On time
BRIDGET BEVAN'S FOUNDATION Received: On time
THE CHURCH ARMY Received: On time
Venerable DORRIEN PAUL DAVIES Trustee 12 November 2017
THE WIDOWS, ORPHANS AND DEPENDANTS SOCIETY OF THE CHURCH IN WALES Received: On time
THE DEAN AND CHAPTER OF ST DAVIDS CATHEDRAL Received: On time
Revd Canon PAUL MACKNESS Trustee
THE REPRESENTATIVE BODY OF THE CHURCH IN WALES Received: On time
Rev Sarah Caroline Rowland Jones Trustee 05 May 2018
THE DEAN AND CHAPTER OF ST DAVIDS CATHEDRAL Received: On time
NICHOLAS GRIFFIN Chair
LAMPETER VELFREY COMMUNITY AND PLAYING FIELD ASSOCIATION Overdue by 126 days
THE REPRESENTATIVE BODY OF THE CHURCH IN WALES Received: On time
Rev Dr MATTHEW ANTHONY ROBERT HILL Trustee 10 July 2019
THE DEAN AND CHAPTER OF ST DAVIDS CATHEDRAL Received: On time
Hybarch/Venerable Rachel Hannah Eileen Davies Trustee 20 June 2019
CADWYN TEIFI Received: On time
Rev Christopher Charles Brown Trustee 01 January 2015 None on record
NIGEL EVANS Trustee 02 December 2015 None on record
HAZEL EVANS Trustee 01 January 2015 None on record
Rev Mounes Anton Farah Trustee 01 January 2015 None on record