ROYAL HUMANE SOCIETY

Charity number: 231469
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £107.94k £71.63k £99.25k £119.53k £270.37k
Total expenditure £112.02k £109.81k £126.14k £126.03k £123.45k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A