Financial history THE ROYAL AIR FORCES ASSOCIATION - CHELMSFORD BRANCH

Charity number: 231521
Charity reporting is overdue by 203 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £8.75k £8.25k £6.70k £9.92k £4.29k
Total expenditure £10.87k £7.45k £6.44k £4.20k £8.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A