THE J H LEVY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 231979
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 13 March 2021 36 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 10 March 2021 399 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 22 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 01 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2016 27 March 2017 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 Not Required