THE ORDER OF FRIARS MINOR

Charity number: 232177
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 29 September 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 24 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 23 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 14 November 2019 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 14 November 2019 14 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 19 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 19 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 25 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 25 October 2017 On time Download