Trustees THE SAINT JOHN'S WOOD SOCIETY
Charity number: 232270
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dick Schumacher | Chair | 01 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Christina Mavrokefalou Diamanti | Trustee | 30 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Elizabeth TREHARNE JONES | Trustee | 30 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laurence Lecacheur | Trustee | 30 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Frind Cragoe | Trustee | 30 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Melvyn Jo Meade-Brunas | Trustee | 30 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tom Thomson | Trustee | 13 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Sanji De Alwis | Trustee | 15 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jane Leaver | Trustee | 16 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Linda Taggart | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
James Edward Hewitt | Trustee | 10 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Poser | Trustee | 13 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
VIRGINIA NEWMAN | Trustee | 01 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE COWDRAY | Trustee | 26 September 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.