Accounts and annual returns THE MARJORIE AND DOROTHY WHYTE MEMORIAL FUND

Charity number: 232388
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2023 09 May 2024 94 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 23 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 20 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 17 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 07 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required