Financial history CONGREGATION OF BROTHERS OF THE SACRED HEARTS OF JESUS AND MARY AND OF PERPETUAL ADORATION OF THE MOST BLESSED SACRAMENT OF THE ALTAR

Charity number: 232406
Charity reporting is overdue by 29 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £153.17k £129.21k £124.84k £116.35k £125.56k
Total expenditure £103.45k £77.04k £81.33k £77.99k £71.75k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A