Accounts and annual returns HERTFORDSHIRE BUILDING PRESERVATION TRUST LTD

Charity number: 232686
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 21 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 16 November 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 29 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 29 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 29 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 29 November 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 21 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 24 November 2017 On time Download Open in new window